N/A
- Buyer Vilma A. Ortiz and Manuel Cuevas
- Seller Chicagoland Housing Rehab Corp., Chicago
N/A
- Buyer Chicagoland Housing Rehab Corp.
- Seller Walter A. Glab (deceased) and Joan Rep Veternik
Feb. 2, 2024 $9,300,000
Apr. 15, 2024 $8,275,000
Sep. 4, 2024 $7,200,000
May. 2, 2024 $6,800,000
Sep. 26, 2023 $5,950,000
Mar. 15, 2024 $5,700,000
Aug. 21, 2024 $5,700,000
Feb. 28, 2024 $5,650,000
Nov. 9, 2023 $5,300,000
Dec. 13, 2023 $5,250,000
Current Owners
Vilma A. Ortiz and Manuel Cuevas
Purchase Price
N/A (1996)
Assessed Value
N/A (2022)
Property Taxes
$14,255 (2022)
Lot Size
7,589 Sqft (0.17 acres)
Tax $/Acre
$83,851 /Acre
Home Size
2,822 Sqft
Beds
N/A
Baths
2
Built
N/A
N/A
N/A
U.S. House of Representatives:
State Senator:
State Representative:
Elementary School: